Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1202624

EP1202624 - AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF COMPOUNDS WITH OF LOW SOLUBILITY IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/19]AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF LOW SOLUBILITY AND LOW STABILITY WATER ADDITIVES
[2004/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest, P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette
Indiana 47996 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/13]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest, P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette, Indiana 47996 / US
Former [2002/19]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette Indiana 47996 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YEOMAN, Alan, M.
3230 Oak Hampton Way
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
02 / GRUNEWALD, Fredrick, A.
2446 Country Grace
New Braunfels, TX 78130 / US
03 / HOWARTH, Jonathan, N.
Apt. 616, 11550 Southfork Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
04 / HARRISON, Alan, D.
4110 Harvest Ridge Drive
Douglasville, GA 30135 / US
05 / SOOK, Brian, R.
3542 Oakwilde Drive
Snellville, GA 30039 / US
06 / KRUPPA, Thomas
2725 Ash Road
Newport, TN 37821 / US
 [2002/19]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date00948975.828.07.2000
[2002/19]
WO2000US20445
Priority number, dateUS1999036345729.07.1999         Original published format: US 363457
[2002/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0108484
Date:08.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1202624
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001
[2002/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1202624
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.02.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/30, A01N33/18, A01N43/10, A01N43/50, A01N43/66, A01N43/70, A01N59/06
[2002/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/19]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE SUSPENSIONEN VON IN WASSER WENIG LÖSLICHEN VERBINDUNGEN[2004/33]
English:AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF COMPOUNDS WITH OF LOW SOLUBILITY IN WATER[2004/33]
French:SUSPENSIONS AQUEUSES DE COMPOSES A FAIBLE SOLUBILITE DANS L'EAU[2004/33]
Former [2002/19]WÄSSRIGE SUSPENSIONEN VON WENIG LÖSLICHEN UND WENIG STABILEN WASSER-ADDITIVEN
Former [2002/19]AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF LOW SOLUBILITY AND LOW STABILITY WATER ADDITIVES
Former [2002/19]SUSPENSIONS AQUEUSES D'ADDITIFS A FAIBLE SOLUBILITE ET A FAIBLE SOLUBILITE DANS L'EAU
Entry into regional phase18.02.2002National basic fee paid 
18.02.2002Search fee paid 
18.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
24.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2005Fee for grant paid
28.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04078314.4  / EP1568276
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Request for further processing for:24.05.2004Request for further processing filed
25.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200405   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
CY28.07.2005
IE28.07.2005
LU28.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/20]DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
CY28.07.2005
IE28.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/08]DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
IE28.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/28]DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
IE28.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/25]DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
IE28.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]DK30.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US5730996  (BEALL GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1-29,32,33,53,56-58,60 * column 29, line 48 - column 30; examples 4,,7B,,8B * * column 3, line 44 - line 50 * * column 22, line 36 - line 48 *;
 [X]EP0496106  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 30-60 * page 2, line 1 - line 40 * * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 20 * * page 14, line 33 - line 60; examples 7,8,12-15 *;
 [X]JPS60180902  ;
 [X]US4941988  (WISE RODNEY M [US]) [X] 30-60 * column 9, line 23 - line 39 * * column 12; examples I,,II *;
 [X]US4051055  (TRINH TOAN, et al) [X] 32,49,50,53-60 * column 3, line 10 - line 17; examples 1,3 * * column 4, line 1 - line 25; examples I,,III *;
 [A]EP0629346  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 30-60 * page 2, line 1 - line 45 *;
 [A]FR2658194  (NORSOLOR SA [FR]) [A] 30-60 * page 1, line 1 - line 20 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 20 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860204), vol. 010, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 326), [X] 30-60 * abstract *
 [X]  - GERSTL, Z. ET AL, Controlled release of pesticides into water from clay -polymer formulations., INSTITUTE OF SOIL, VOLCANI CENTER, BET DAGAN, ISRAEL., JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, SEPT 1998. VOL. 46, NO. 9. P. 3803-3809 PUBLISHER: WASHINGTON, D.C.: AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. CODEN: JAFCAU;ISSN: 0021-8561, XP002205376 [X] 32,53,56,58,60 * page 3804, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf980184p
International search[Y]US5730996  (BEALL GARY W [US], et al);
 [Y]US4051055  (TRINH TOAN, et al);
 [Y]US4941988  (WISE RODNEY M [US]);
 [Y]US5376297  (CHOY CLEMENT K [US], et al)