blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1198644

EP1198644 - SUSPENDED RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PANDROL LIMITED
63 Station Road
Addlestone
Surrey KT15 2AR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
PANDROL LIMITED
63 Station Road Addlestone
Surrey KT15 2AR / GB
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
PANDROL LIMITED
63 Station Road
Addlestone, Surrey KT15 2AR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PORRILL, John, Phillip
18 Minster Road
Godalming, Surrey GU7 1SP / GB
02 / COX, Stephen, John
5 Selwyn Avenue
Richmond, Surrey TW9 2HB / GB
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00949700.920.07.2000
[2002/17]
WO2000GB02810
Priority number, dateGB1999001714621.07.1999         Original published format: GB 9917146
[2002/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0106061
Date:25.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1198644
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1198644
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:E01B9/60
[2002/17]
CPC:
E01B9/60 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO16.01.2002
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFGEHÄNGTE SCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSEINHEIT[2002/17]
English:SUSPENDED RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBLY[2002/17]
French:ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION DE RAIL SUSPENDU[2002/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2002National basic fee paid 
16.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2005Fee for grant paid
11.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
[2009/02]
Former [2006/15]GR28.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US5104041  (REMINGTON JAMES A [US]) [X] 6 * column 6, lines 3-44; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]US5221044  (GUINS SERGEI G [US]) [X] 17 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 16; figures 2-4 * [A] 6,11,15,16;
 [DA]EP0758418  (PANDROL LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1* column 13, line 51 - column 15, line 5; figures 11-14 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.