Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1196751

EP1196751 - LEAK TESTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2007  [2007/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pampinella, Joseph A.
9707 Mill Race Estates Drives
Vienna, VA 22182 / US
[2002/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/16]
Representative(s)Akers, Noel James , et al
N.J. Akers & Co
63 Lemon Street
Truro, TR1 2PN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/32]Akers, Noel James , et al
N.J. Akers & Co. 7 Ferris Town Truro
Cornwall TR1 3JG / GB
Former [2005/11]Akers, Noel James , et al
N.J. Akers & Co. Ltd., Grey Friars, Spring Road
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 3PP / GB
Former [2002/16]Akers, Noel James , et al
Howrey Simon Arnold & White, City Point, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2V 9AW / GB
Application number, filing date00950261.828.06.2000
[2002/16]
WO2000US17801
Priority number, dateUS1999034043828.06.1999         Original published format: US 340438
[2002/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0101101
Date:04.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1196751
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001
[2002/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.01.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/04, F16L55/10
[2002/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR LECKPRÜFUNG[2002/16]
English:LEAK TESTING DEVICE[2002/16]
French:SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE FUITES[2002/16]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2002National basic fee paid 
22.01.2002Search fee paid 
22.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
03.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/47]
06.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200607   M06   Not yet paid
30.06.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4194721  (NACHTIGAL CARSTEN [CA]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 56-68 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 50 *;
 [A]US3860038  (FORNI JOSEPH M) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, lines 16-62 *
International search[A]US4194721  (NACHTIGAL CARSTEN [CA]);
 [A]US4895181  (MCKAVANAGH THOMAS P [CA]);
 [A]US5287730  (CONDON DUANE R [US]);
 [A]US5076095  (ERHARDT RICK D [US]);
 [A]US4429568  (SULLIVAN RICHARD N [US])