Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257575

EP1257575 - RADIOLABELED VASOACTIVE INTESTINAL PEPTIDE ANALOGS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND RADIOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2008
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dabur Research Foundation
22, Site IV, Sahibabad
Ghaziabad, 201 010 / IN
[2007/09]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Dabur Research Foundation
22, Site IV
Sahibabad, Ghaziabad, 201 010 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / Burman, Anand C.
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghazibad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
02 / Prasad, Sudhanand
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
03 / Mukherjee, Rama
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
04 / Dutt, Sarjana
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
05 / Sharma, Rajan
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
06 / Ahuja, Rinku
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
07 / Mishra, Anil K. Institute of Nuclear Medicine and
Allied Sciences, Lucknow Road
Delhi 110 054 / IN
08 / Matthew, Lazar T.
Old Lucknow Road Timarpure
Delhi 110 054 / IN
 [2003/29]
Former [2002/47]01 / Burman, Anand C.
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghazibad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
02 / Prasad, Sudhanand
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
03 / Mukherjee, Rama
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
04 / Dutt, Sarjana
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
05 / Sharma, Rajan
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
06 / Ahuja, Rinku
22, Site IV Sahibabad Ghaziabad 201 010
Uttar Pradesh / IN
07 / Mishra, Anil K.
Old Lucknow Road Timarpure
Delhi 110 054 / IN
08 / Matthew, Lazar T.
Old Lucknow Road Timarpure
Delhi 110 054 / IN
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date00950907.631.07.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000US20874
Priority number, dateINDE01370018.02.2000         Original published format: IN DE013700
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160863
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257575
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257575
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/575, A61K38/22, A61P35/00, A61K51/08
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:RADIOMARKIERTE VIP-ANALOGE ZUR DIAGNOSE UND THERAPIE[2002/47]
English:RADIOLABELED VASOACTIVE INTESTINAL PEPTIDE ANALOGS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND RADIOTHERAPY[2002/47]
French:ANALOGUES RADIOMARQUES DE PEPTIDE INTESTINAL VASOACTIF DESTINES AU DIAGNOSTIC ET A LA RADIOTHERAPIE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2002National basic fee paid 
13.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
07.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
10.07.2006Fee for grant paid
10.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06]
Request for further processing for:10.07.2006Request for further processing filed
10.07.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.07.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200607   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
CY28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
GB31.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
LU31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
CY28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
GB31.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2008/52]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
GB31.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
Former [2008/45]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
GB31.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
FR19.10.2007
Former [2008/26]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
GB31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
FR19.10.2007
Former [2008/22]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
FR19.10.2007
Former [2008/19]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2008/09]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
DE30.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI28.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9630055  (DIATIDE INC [US], et al) [A] * example 4; claim - *;
 [A]WO9101144  (SANDOZ AG [AT], et al);
 [A]WO0005260  (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al);
 [A]EP0796867  (ITOHAM FOODS INC [JP])
 [A]  - NOKIHARA, KIYOSHI ET AL., "RECEPTOR RECOGNITION OF PACAP AND VIP EXAMINED BY BINDING STUDIES CAMP PRODUCTION AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIONS BOTH IN VIVO AND IN VITRO BY MEANS OF SELECTIVE RESIDUE SUBSTITUTION", PEPT 1996 PROC EUR PEPT SYMP 24TH (1998) MEETING DATE 1996 63-66 EDITOR(S) RAMAGE ROBERT EPTON ROGER PUBLISHER MAYFLOWER SCIENTIFIC KINGSWINFORD UK, XP002153330