Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240433

EP1240433 - Dry compressing vacuum pump having a gas ballast device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
[2006/29]
Former [2004/42]For all designated states
Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Leybold Vakuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ARNDT, Lutz
Graf-Galen-Strasse 13
D-53844 Troisdorf / DE
02 / DREIFERT, Thomas
Falkenweg 5
50171 Kerpen / DE
03 / HÖLZEMER, Michael
Im Rauland 88
D-50127 Bergheim 3 / DE
04 / MEYER, Jürgen
Jordeweg 22
D-50259 Pulheim / DE
05 / SCHÖNBORN, Frank
Im Weidenkamp 9
D-51061 Köln / DE
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Leineweber, Jürgen
Patentanwalt
Siebachstrasse 47
50733 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys.
Aggerstrasse 24
50859 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00951529.723.08.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000EP08201
Priority number, dateDE199916244522.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19962445
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146592
Date:28.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240433
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240433
Date:19.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:F04C25/02, F04C25/00, F04B37/14, F04B37/20
[2006/15]
Former International [2002/38]F04C29/10, F04B25/00, F04B37/14, F04B37/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trockenverdichtende Vakuumpumpe mit Gasballasteinrichtung[2002/38]
English:Dry compressing vacuum pump having a gas ballast device[2002/38]
French:Pompe à vide à compression sèche comportant un dispositif de ballast à gaz[2006/14]
Former [2002/38]Pompe a vide a compression seche comportant un dispositif de ballast a gaz
Entry into regional phase04.05.2002National basic fee paid 
04.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2006Fee for grant paid
15.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26]
Request for further processing for:27.01.2006Request for further processing filed
27.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.02.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT19.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[XAY]GB1364854  (CENCO INC) [X] 1 * page 3, line 93 - line 114 * * page 5, line 47 - line 84; figure 2 * [A] 2 [Y] 3,5,6;
 [Y]US3677664  (WYCLIFFE HENRYK, et al) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 40 - line 65; figures 3,4; claim 1 *;
 [YA]DE19709206  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1,3 * [A] 1;
 [XA]US5209653  (MURRAY GARY P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 49 - line 66 * * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 4; figure 3 * [A] 2;
 [A]US5573387  (HOLBROOK ALAN E K [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,8 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5066202  (BERGES HANNS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH076962
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, [A] 1,2 * abstract *