blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1210914 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1210914



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 720
12.06.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
04.06.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 38
17.03.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.04.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.03.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.03.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
28.01.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
24.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
21.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
24.09.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.09.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.09.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
09.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Description Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
16.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.04.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.04.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
04.03.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 52
04.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 38
04.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
04.03.2002 Description Search / examination 16
04.03.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Drawings Search / examination 11
04.03.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
04.03.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.03.2002 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 25
08.01.2002 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 32
08.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
15.11.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 32
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.11.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.11.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.10.2001 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.10.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
22.10.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
22.10.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.10.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 15
22.10.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.10.2001 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.10.2001 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
19.10.2001 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
19.10.2001 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.10.2001 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 15
19.10.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2001 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.07.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.05.2001 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 41
17.05.2001 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.03.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.03.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.03.2001 Priority document Search / examination 36
16.03.2001 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2001 Abstract PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2001 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
16.03.2001 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 15
16.03.2001 Drawings PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
16.03.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
16.03.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 15
06.03.2001 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2001 Drawings PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
06.03.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.03.2001 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.03.2001 Drawings PCT Chapter 2 procedure 11
05.03.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.02.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.02.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.02.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 37