blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1210914


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.11.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
03.10.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
27.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2007  [2007/35]
25.05.2007 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
13.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
19.01.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2007  [2007/08]
01.09.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2006  [2006/40]
28.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2006  [2006/35]
09.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2006  [2006/28]
14.04.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
17.03.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.05.2006  [2006/18]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
11.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2005  [2005/52]
28.10.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
25.03.2005 (Expected) grant published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
16.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.09.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.02.2004 First examination report
04.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2002 Change - extension states
17.09.2002 Renewal fee
19.04.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.06.2002  [2002/23]
19.04.2002 Request for examination filed published on  05.06.2002  [2002/23]
17.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
10.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication