blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1210914
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1210914Global Dossier 11.05.2005B1
EP1210914 05.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
ES0000310 04.08.2000
ES9901798 05.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT295126T 15.05.2005T
Priority number Date
ES0000310 04.08.2000
ES9901798 05.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6444700 05.03.2001A
Priority number Date
ES0000310 04.08.2000
ES9901798 05.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60020131D 16.06.2005D1
Priority number Date
ES0000310 04.08.2000
ES9901798 05.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0110317Global Dossier 15.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
ES9901798 05.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2153331 01.09.2001B1
ES2153331 16.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
ES9901798 05.08.1999