Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1210914

EP1210914 - INTERVERTEBRAL FIXING SYSTEM USED IN TREATMENTS OF THE SPINAL COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRAIBER, S.A.
Poligono "Mas De Les Animes", Joan Oliver, 13, 15, 17
43206 Reus / ES
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
TRAIBER, S.A.
Poligono "Mas De Les Animes", Joan Oliver, 13, 15, 17
43206 Reus / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MARQUEZ ALVAREZ, Luis, Poligono Mas de Les Animes
Calle Joan Oliver, 13-17
43206 Reus / ES
 [2002/23]
Representative(s)Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35
28014 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date00951549.504.08.2000
[2002/23]
WO2000ES00310
Priority number, dateES1999000179805.08.1999         Original published format: ES 9901798
[2002/23]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0110317
Date:15.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1210914
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001
[2002/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1210914
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES15.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2002/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERVERTEBRALES FIXIERUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG DES RÜCKGRATES[2002/23]
English:INTERVERTEBRAL FIXING SYSTEM USED IN TREATMENTS OF THE SPINAL COLUMN[2002/23]
French:SYSTEME DE FIXATION INTERVERTEBRAL UTILISE DANS LES TRAITEMENTS DE LA COLONNE VERTEBRALE[2002/23]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2002Translation filed 
04.03.2002National basic fee paid 
04.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
06.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2005Fee for grant paid
07.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
FR11.05.2005
IT11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
CY04.08.2005
IE04.08.2005
LU04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
IT11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
CY04.08.2005
IE04.08.2005
LU04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
FR31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2007/35]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
IT11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
CY04.08.2005
IE04.08.2005
LU04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2007/26]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
CY04.08.2005
IE04.08.2005
LU04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2007/20]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
CY04.08.2005
IE04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2007/08]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
IE04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GB11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/40]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
IE04.08.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/35]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
DE12.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/28]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/22]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
CH11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
LI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
ES22.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT11.05.2005
BE11.05.2005
FI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI11.05.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE11.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19720782  (SYNTHES AG [CH]);
 [A]WO9834554  (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al);
 [A]US5681319  (BIEDERMANN LUTZ [DE], et al);
 [A]WO9844859  (DIMSO SA [FR], et al);
 [A]US5899903  (COTREL YVES P [FR]);
 [A]US5733285  (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al)