Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235956

EP1235956 - THREAD FEEDING APPARATUS FOR AN AUTOMATIC EMBROIDERING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inbro Co., Ltd.
Venture Business Incubation Center, No. 205, Busan Polytechnic College, Dukcheon-dong, Buk-ku
Busan City / KR
[2007/04]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Inbro Co., Ltd.
Venture Business Incubation Center, No. 205, Busan Polytechnic College, Dukcheon-dong, Buk-ku
Busan City, Republic of Korea / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Ham-Kyu
103-406 Hyundai Apt., Kaekum 3-dong, Pusanjin-ku
Pusan 614-113 / KR
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Geary, Stuart Lloyd , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Geary, Stuart Lloyd , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00952053.717.08.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000KR00917
Priority number, dateKR1999001698617.08.1999         Original published format: KR 9916986
JP2000000281127.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000002811
KR20000019257U05.07.2000         Original published format: KR 2000019257 U
WO2000KR0085402.08.2000         Original published format: PCT/KR00/00854
[2002/36]
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0118297
Date:15.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235956
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235956
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.03.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:D05C11/10
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FADENZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN STICKAUTOMATEN[2002/36]
English:THREAD FEEDING APPARATUS FOR AN AUTOMATIC EMBROIDERING MACHINE[2002/36]
French:APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION DE FIL POUR MACHINE A BRODER AUTOMATIQUE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2001Translation filed 
13.02.2002National basic fee paid 
13.02.2002Search fee paid 
13.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
13.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
28.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2006Fee for grant paid
07.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
CY24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
IT24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
GR25.04.2007
ES05.05.2007
IE17.08.2007
LU17.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]AT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
CY24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
IT24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
GR25.04.2007
ES05.05.2007
IE17.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/45]AT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
IT24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
GR25.04.2007
ES05.05.2007
IE17.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/23]AT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
IT24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
GR25.04.2007
ES05.05.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/19]AT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
GR25.04.2007
ES05.05.2007
Former [2008/01]AT24.01.2007
BE24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
ES05.05.2007
Former [2007/46]AT24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
FI24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
ES05.05.2007
Former [2007/39]FI24.01.2007
NL24.01.2007
ES05.05.2007
Former [2007/36]FI24.01.2007
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19624344  (ZSK STICKMASCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,11;
 [DA]JPH06254277  (BARUDAN CO LTD) [DA] 1,11
International search[A]JPS59184785U  ;
 [A]JPS58189189U  ;
 [A]JPS5947696U  ;
 [A]JPS5947697U  ;
 [A]JPH0174296U