Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1204513

EP1204513 - MANUAL SHAVING RAZORS WITH GLIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andrews, Edward A.
6835 Beach Road
Troy, MI 48098 / US
[2002/20]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/20]
Representative(s)Tranter, Andrew David
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Tranter, Andrew David
Barker Bretell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2002/20]Tranter, Andrew David
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date00952278.027.07.2000
[2002/20]
WO2000US20673
Priority number, dateUS1999036143127.07.1999         Original published format: US 361431
US1999036143327.07.1999         Original published format: US 361433
[2002/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0107214
Date:01.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1204513
Date:15.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001
[2002/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.02.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/22
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/20]B26B21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO08.03.2002
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HANDRASIERER MIT GLEITERN[2002/20]
English:MANUAL SHAVING RAZORS WITH GLIDES[2002/20]
French:RASOIRS A MAIN A PATINS[2002/20]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2002National basic fee paid 
27.02.2002Search fee paid 
26.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/20]
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/12]
19.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200304   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9717174  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,16-19,21,29,30,32,33,39,75,76 * page 7, line 19 - page 11, line 24; figures 7,8,11,12 *
International search[X]US5369885  (FERRARO FRANK A [US])