Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1200092

EP1200092 - BETA-CARBOLINE DRUG PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lilly ICOS LLC
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Lilly Icos LLC
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Neil, R.
906 Northwestern Avenue
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
02 / HARTAUER, Kerry, J.
14907 Pacer Court
Carmel, IN 46032 / US
03 / KRAL, Martha, A.
6125 Haverford Avenue
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
04 / STEPHENSON, Gregory, A.
10227 Bent Tree Lane
Fishers, IN 46032 / US
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Richardson, Kate
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Richardson, Kate
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00952371.301.08.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000US20981
Priority number, dateUS19990147048P03.08.1999         Original published format: US 147048 P
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0108688
Date:08.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1200092
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1200092
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4985, A61K9/14, A61P15/10
[2002/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/18]
Extension statesAL17.01.2002
LT17.01.2002
LV17.01.2002
MK17.01.2002
RO17.01.2002
SI17.01.2002
TitleGerman:BETA-CARBOLIN ARZNEISTOFFPRODUKTE[2002/18]
English:BETA-CARBOLINE DRUG PRODUCTS[2002/18]
French:PRODUITS DE MEDICAMENTS A BASE DE BETA-CARBOLINE[2002/18]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2002National basic fee paid 
17.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
26.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2004Fee for grant paid
11.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH21.04.2004
LI21.04.2004
[2017/07]
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9638131  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-19 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 11 * * page 14, line 13 - page 17, line 4 *;
 [A]GB2293103  (CEPHALON INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 15 *