Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242935

EP1242935 - POINT OF SALE PAYMENT TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2010  [2010/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
First Data Corporation
401 Hackensack Avenue
Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / TEMPLETON, Randy
5119 Patrick Henry
Houston, TX 77401 / US
02 / MOLLETT, Sandy
1507-A Harold
Houston, TX 77006 / US
03 / SMITH, David, Wayne
4730 Rainbow Run
Sugarland, TX 77479 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date00952696.309.08.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US21772
Priority number, dateUS19990147899P09.08.1999         Original published format: US 147899 P
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0111528
Date:15.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242935
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.02.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G07F19/00, G07F7/08, G07G1/12
[2004/38]
Former International [2002/39]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHLUNGSTERMINAL FÜR VERKAUFSSTELLEN[2002/39]
English:POINT OF SALE PAYMENT TERMINAL[2002/39]
French:TERMINAL DE PAIEMENT POUR POINT DE VENTE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2002National basic fee paid 
12.02.2002Search fee paid 
12.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
17.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2006Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/35]
13.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal  [2010/35]
Appeal following examination11.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1574/06
20.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2010Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5053607  (CARLSON PAUL R ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,15-18 * abstract * * column 7, lines 21-24 * * column 11, lines 1-19 * * column 13, line 23 - line 36 * * column 17, lines 13-23 * * column 26, lines 31-33 * [Y] 5,10,14;
 [Y]EP0707971  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 5,14 * figure 1 * * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 32 *;
 [Y]US3599151  (HARR JEROME DANFORTH) [Y] 10 * column 6, paragraph L; figure 11 * * abstract *;
 [X]US4321672  (BRAUN EDWARD L ET AL) [X] 1-3,6,9 * column 2, line 34 - line 44 * * column 7, line 9 - line 18 * * column 8, line 37 - line 45 * * column 17, line 23 - line 29 * * column 23, line 12 - line 25 *;
 [X]US5484988  (HILLS ROBERT R ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,15-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - line 35 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 38 *;
 [A]US4758714  (CARLSON PAUL R ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-18 * figures 1,2,4 * * column 1, line 39 - line 42 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 29 * * column 8, line 12 - column 10, line 12 *
 [X]  - VERIFONE FINANCE, pages 1 - 3, URL: www.vfi-finance.com/tranz330.htm, XP002933479 [X] 1-4,6-9,13,15-18 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5815657  ;
 [Y]US5677955  ;
 [YP]US6039245  ;
 [Y]US5119293
 [X]  - "Tranz 330 fast, low-cost transaction automation at the pont of service", VIROFONE FINANCE, (199901), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.vfi-finance.com/tranz330.htm, XP002933479