blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1242231 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1242231



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 293
11.02.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
15.06.2010 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 16
25.05.2010 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 2
09.04.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
10.05.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.04.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.04.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
18.04.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.04.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.04.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.04.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
02.04.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.03.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
16.03.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
15.03.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.03.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
22.02.2007 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
20.02.2007 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
15.12.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.12.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.12.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
14.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
11.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
11.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
17.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
20.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
24.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
24.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
14.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.04.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
24.04.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
23.04.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 3
23.04.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
07.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.08.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.08.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.07.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.07.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.12.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.09.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
25.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 24
25.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 22
30.03.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.03.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.03.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
22.03.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
14.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
12.09.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.09.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 4
12.09.2000 Description International Searching Authority 9
12.09.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 7
12.09.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 1