blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1242231


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
10.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
02.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2008  [2008/23]
11.04.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.05.2008  [2008/20]
04.04.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.05.2008  [2008/19]
01.02.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2008  [2008/10]
26.10.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2007  [2007/48]
15.06.2007 Change - representative published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
04.05.2007 (Expected) grant published on  06.06.2007  [2007/23]
27.04.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.04.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.03.2007 Change - applicant published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
30.03.2007 Change - representative published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
16.03.2007 Change - applicant published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
12.12.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.09.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.02.2006 Change - German title published on  12.04.2006  [2006/15]
09.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.11.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.01.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2003 Examination report or reply
09.05.2003 Change - applicant published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
09.05.2003 Change - inventor published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
07.02.2003 First examination report
04.02.2003 Examination report or reply
13.11.2002 Change - extension states
18.09.2002 Renewal fee
09.08.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.09.2002  [2002/39]
09.08.2002 Request for examination filed published on  25.09.2002  [2002/39]
26.06.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication