blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1242231
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1242231Global Dossier 06.06.2007B1
EP1242231 25.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6703900 17.04.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR0013861 21.05.2002A
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2383550 22.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50014392D 19.07.2007D1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE50014392 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA02002506 30.07.2002A
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO323131B 08.01.2007B1
NO20021068L 08.05.2002L
NO20021068D 04.03.2002D0
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6838148 04.01.2005B1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
EP0008427 30.08.2000
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0119599Global Dossier 22.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT363982T 15.06.2007T
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19949318 15.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2288865T 01.02.2008T3
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
DE19949318 13.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1242231E 17.09.2007E
Priority number Date
DE19943442 11.09.1999
DE19949318 13.10.1999