Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242231

EP1242231 - METHOD OF FABRICATION OF MULTI-AXIALLY REINFORCED COMPONENTS MADE OF UD FIBRE REINFORCED SMC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/39]CARBON-FIBRE REINFORCED SMC FOR MULTI-AXIALLY REINFORCED COMPONENTS
[2006/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.04.2008
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Menzolit-Fibron GmbH
Hermann-Beuttenmüller-Str. 11-13
75015 Bretten / DE
[2007/18]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Menzolit-Fibron GmbH
Hermann-Beuttenmüller-Str. 11-13
75015 Bretten / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Volkswagen AG
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Menzolit-Fibron GmbH
Hermann-Beuttenmüller-Str. 11-13
75015 Bretten / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Volkswagen AG
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Menzolit-Fibron GmbH
Hermann-Beuttenmüller-Str. 11-13
75015 Bretten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / EHNERT, Gerd
Königsbergerstrasse 19
D-76694 Forst / DE
02 / BIENIEK, Klaus
Talstrasse 5
D-75438 Knittlingen-Hohenklingen / DE
03 / ILZHOEFER, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schimmingweg 37
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
04 / STIEG, Jürgen
Fasanenweg 4
38553 Wasbüttel / DE
 [2003/26]
Former [2002/39]01 / EHNERT, Gerd
Königsbergerstrasse 19
D-76694 Forst / DE
02 / BIENIEK, Klaus
Talstrasse 5
D-75438 Knittlingen-Hohenklingen / DE
Representative(s)Lichti, Heiner , et al
Lichti - Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/29]Lichti, Heiner , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [2007/18]Scherzberg, Andreas Hans
c/o Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2002/39]Scherzberg, Andreas, Dr.
c/o DYNAMIT NOBEL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, -Patente, Marken & Lizenzen-
53839 Troisdorf / DE
Application number, filing date00954667.230.08.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000EP08427
Priority number, dateDE199914344211.09.1999         Original published format: DE 19943442
DE199914931813.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19949318
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0119599
Date:22.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242231
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242231
Date:06.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/46, C08J5/24, B29C70/10, B29C70/18, B29C70/20
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MULTIAXIAL VERSTÄRKTEN BAUTEILEN AUS UD-FASERVERSTÄRKTEM SMC[2006/15]
English:METHOD OF FABRICATION OF MULTI-AXIALLY REINFORCED COMPONENTS MADE OF UD FIBRE REINFORCED SMC[2006/15]
French:MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS RENFORCÉS MULTI-AXIAUX COMPOSÉS DE PREIMPREGNES RENFORCES PAR DES FIBRES UNIDIRECTIONELLES[2006/15]
Former [2002/39]KOHLENSTOFFASERVERSTÄRKTES SMC FÜR MULTIAXIAL VERSTÄRKTE BAUTEILE
Former [2002/39]CARBON-FIBRE REINFORCED SMC FOR MULTI-AXIALLY REINFORCED COMPONENTS
Former [2002/39]PREIMPREGNE RENFORCE PAR DES FIBRES DE CARBONE POUR COMPOSANTS RENFORCES MULTI-AXIAUX
Entry into regional phase11.04.2002National basic fee paid 
11.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2007Fee for grant paid
18.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.06.2007
DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
LU30.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
GR07.09.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]CY06.06.2007
DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
MC31.08.2007
GR07.09.2007
Former [2008/23]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
MC31.08.2007
GR07.09.2007
Former [2008/19]FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
GR07.09.2007
Former [2008/10]FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
Former [2007/48]FI06.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]US4141929  (STOOPS REGINALD B, et al) [X] 1-26 * column 2, lines 23-27; figures 1,2; claims 1,7-9 *;
 [X]US4532169  (CARLEY EARL P [US]) [X] 1-26 * figures 2-5; claims 1-47 *;
 [X]US3183142  (TIERNEY HUBERT J) [X] 1-26 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2266595  (PEUGEOT & RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1411011  (FAIREY SA) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19534627  (POTT RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1-26 * figure 5; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]EP0062973  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 12-26 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *