Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1144803

EP1144803 - DOWNHOLE FLAPPER VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Quartech Engineering Limited
34 Exeter Close
Tonbridge, Kent TN10 4NT / GB
[2002/15]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
French Oilfield Services Limited
34 Exeter Close
Tonbridge, Kent TN10 3NT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FRENCH, Clive, John
Boulevard de la Meuse, 114
B-5100 Jambes / BE
 [2001/42]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]Shanks, Andrew , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date00954718.317.08.2000
[2001/42]
WO2000GB03200
Priority number, dateGB1999001927017.08.1999         Original published format: GB 9919270
[2001/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0112949
Date:22.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1144803
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001
[2001/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B34/10
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLAPPENVENTILVORRICHTUNG FÜR BOHRLÖCHER[2001/42]
English:DOWNHOLE FLAPPER VALVE ASSEMBLY[2001/42]
French:ENSEMBLE OUTIL[2001/42]
MiscellaneousEPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar.
EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available.
EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles.
Entry into regional phase30.05.2001National basic fee paid 
30.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
17.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200203   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2003
31.08.200304   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2003
31.08.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4149698  (DEATON THOMAS M) [X] 1-3,5,8,13,37 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 66 * * column 5, line 23 - line 60 * * column 6, line 8 - line 30 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 20 *;
 [X]EP0915230  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 1 *;
 [X]US3696868  (TAYLOR DONALD F JR) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9747852  (PETROLEUM ENG SERVICES [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4531587  (FINEBERG DOUGLAS H [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [PX]WO0029710  (CAMCO INT [US]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 26, line 3 - page 27, line 23 * * page 30, line 5 - page 31, line 18 *;
 [PX]US6003605  (DICKSON RENNIE L [US], et al) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - line 59 * * column 5, line 23 - line 44 *
by applicantGB2351988