Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1210022

EP1210022 - NON-STICK ELECTROSURGICAL FORCEPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 01.10.2014  [2014/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker Sales Corporation
2825 Airview Boulevard
Kalamazoo, MI / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
Striker Sales Corporation
2825 Airview Boulevard
Kalamazoo, MI / US
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Link Technology Inc.
3215 Marine Street, Suite W-182
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
Link Technology Inc.
3215 Marine Street, Suite W-182
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THORNE, Jonathan, O.
1075 10th Street
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
 [2002/23]
Representative(s)Catesby, Olivia Joanne
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]Catesby, Olivia Joanne
Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2003/33]Lane, Cathal Michael
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2003/03]Moore, Barry
Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2002/23]Curley, Donnacha John , et al
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date00955865.123.08.2000
[2002/23]
WO2000US23181
Priority number, dateUS1999038486427.08.1999         Original published format: US 384864
[2002/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0115615
Date:08.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1210022
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001
[2002/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1210022
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.03.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2002/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/23]
TitleGerman:NICHTKLEBENDE ELEKTRONISCHE ZANGE[2002/23]
English:NON-STICK ELECTROSURGICAL FORCEPS[2002/23]
French:FORCEPS ELECTROCHIRURGICAUX NON ADHERENTS[2002/23]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2002National basic fee paid 
18.02.2002Search fee paid 
18.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.02.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2006Fee for grant paid
08.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.11.2006  17.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
KLS Martin GmbH + Co. KG
Am Gansacker 1b
79224 Umkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Maucher, Wolfgang, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/29]
Opponent(s)01  09.11.2006  17.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
KLS Martin GmbH + Co. KG
Am Gansacker 1b
79224 Umkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Maucher, Wolfgang, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  09.11.2006  17.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
KLS Martin GmbH + Co. KG
Am Gansacker 1b
79224 Umkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Maucher, Wolfgang, et al
Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
Former [2006/51]
Opponent(s)01  09.11.2006   
KLS Martin GmbH + Co. KG
Am Gansacker 1b
79224 Umkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Maucher, Wolfgang, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
26.02.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.09.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.09.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
28.09.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.09.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.04.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.05.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/40]
Appeal following opposition17.02.2009Appeal received No.  T0429/09
17.02.2009Statement of grounds filed
02.09.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
02.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
CY12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE23.08.2006
LU23.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/36]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE23.08.2006
LU23.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2008/19]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE23.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/42]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE23.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/35]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/19]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/13]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/09]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/08]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2007/03]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/51]FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/50]SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE12.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3685518  (BEUERLE HERBERT, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 30-51; figure 2 * [Y] 2-15;
 [Y]WO9853750  (SPORTS LINK INC DOING BUSINESS [US]) [Y] 2,6-15 * page 13, lines 3-5 * * page 12, lines 24-27 * * claim 15 *;
 [Y]US5885281  (URUETA R WILFRIDO [US]) [Y] 3-5 * column 3, lines 42-60 *
International search[X]US3685518  (BEUERLE HERBERT, et al);
 [X]US5693052  (WEAVER DREW D [US]);
 [AP]US6059783  (KIRWAN JR LAWRENCE T [US]);
 [X]EP0246350  (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE])
by applicantUS4785807
 US4333467
 US4074718
 US4492231
 US5423814
 US5196009