Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1253958

EP1253958 - A SINGLE-USE SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
bioMD LIMITED
Level 11, 225 St George's Terrace
Perth, WA 6000 / AU
[2005/01]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Afra Design PTY. Limited
11 Patterson Street
Tahmoor, NSW 2573 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / POPOVSKY, Frank
11 Patterson Street
Tahmoor, NSW 2573 / AU
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2002/45]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacob , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00955961.830.08.2000
[2002/45]
WO2000AU01027
Priority number, dateAU2000PQ0524927.01.2000         Original published format: AU PQ524900
AU2000PQ0848403.07.2000         Original published format: AU PQ848400
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154758
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1253958
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1253958
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU02.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32, A61M5/50, A61M5/46
[2003/24]
Former International [2002/45]A61M5/32, A61M5/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINWEGSPRITZE[2002/45]
English:A SINGLE-USE SYRINGE[2002/45]
French:SERINGUE A USAGE UNIQUE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2002National basic fee paid 
27.08.2002Search fee paid 
27.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
27.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
01.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2004Fee for grant paid
11.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04076405.2  / EP1464353
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.11.2004
BE10.11.2004
FI10.11.2004
GR10.02.2005
PT10.04.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2005/51]AT10.11.2004
BE10.11.2004
FI10.11.2004
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT10.11.2004
FI10.11.2004
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI10.11.2004
GR10.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI10.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5980494  (MALENCHEK ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 55; figures 1,2,7,8,14-22 *;
 [A]US5681291  (GALLI ROSARIA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 29; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]US4894055  (SUDNAK PAUL J [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-8 *
International search[A]EP0680767  (RIGHI NARDINO [IT], et al);
 [A]WO9835714  (RESTELLI SERGIO [IT], et al);
 [A]WO9856437  (SOFIC [FR], et al);
 [A]WO9300949  (IVALDA SPA [IT], et al);
 [A]US5342309  (HAUSSER RODERICK J [US])