Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236368

EP1236368 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNALLING INFORMATION, A MASTER STATION, A MOBILE STATION AND MESSAGE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.09.2009
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2007/28]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HANS, Martin
Spandauer Weg 9
D-31141 Hildesheim / DE
02 / LAUMEN, Josef
Hansering 56
D-31141 Hildesheim / DE
03 / BECKMANN, Mark
Vogelweg 7
D-31789 Hameln / DE
04 / DEICHMANN, Volker
Hasestrasse 12
D-31137 Hildesheim / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Molnia, David
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]Molnia, David
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2010/39]Schneider, Günther Martin , et al
Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67
81629 München / DE
Former [2007/28]Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date00956059.030.06.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000DE02128
Priority number, dateDE199914143230.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19941432
DE199914276808.09.1999         Original published format: DE 19942768
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0117303
Date:08.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236368
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236368
Date:21.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/43]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP08.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/14, H04L27/36
[2009/23]
Former International [2002/36]H04Q7/38, H04L27/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SIGNALISIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN, SENDESTATION, MOBILSTATION UND NACHRICHTENELEMENTE[2002/36]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNALLING INFORMATION, A MASTER STATION, A MOBILE STATION AND MESSAGE ELEMENTS[2002/36]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE SIGNALISATION, STATION D'EMISSION, STATION MOBILE ET ELEMENTS DE MESSAGE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2002National basic fee paid 
02.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
14.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2009Fee for grant paid
03.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09173415.2  / EP2146524
EP10182887.9  / EP2365707
EP15173436.5  / EP2961121
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Microsoft Mobile Oy
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Burchardi, Thomas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 03  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 [2017/16]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 02  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Burchardi, Thomas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 03  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner
Patentanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Burchardi, Thomas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 03  21.07.2010  10.08.2010  ADMISSIBLE
HTC CORPORATION
No. 23 Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City
330 / CN
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/36]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  21.07.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Burchardi, Thomas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 03  21.07.2010   
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/34]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  21.07.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Burchardi, Thomas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Former [2010/29]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2010  15.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
25.08.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.03.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB30.06.2011
[2015/21]
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0888026  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 1-3,6,14-16,20,24-29 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 4,5,7-13,17-19,21-23;
 [YA]WO9828888  (GTE GOVERNMENT SYST [US]) [Y] 1-3,6,14-16,20,24-29 * abstract * * page 7, lines 5-15 * [A] 4,5,7-13,17-19,21-23;
 [A]WO9935872  (LE KHIEM [US]) [A] 26-29 * abstract * * page 16, line 22 - page 19, line 10; figures 4-8 *;
 [A]WO9823122  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,15,20 * abstract *