03.11.2017 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
20.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
20.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
17.03.2017 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.09.2016 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.08.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
08.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
01.05.2015 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
06.03.2015 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
25.03.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
08.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
21.12.2010 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
27.08.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
20.08.2010 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
06.08.2010 |
Opposition filed |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
23.07.2010 |
Opposition filed |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
18.06.2010 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
23.10.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
18.09.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
12.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
01.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
25.04.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2007 |
First examination report |
|
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
08.06.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
07.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
19.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
12.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|