blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1210161

EP1210161 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited
First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace
Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited
First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace
Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CORR, Stuart
31 Foxhills Close, Appleton
Warrington, Cheshire WA4 5DH / GB
02 / LOW, Robert, E.
17 The Crescent, Leftwich
Northwich, Cheshire / GB
03 / MURPHY, Frederick, Thomas
53 Fairways
Frodsham, Cheshire WA6 7RY / GB
04 / MORRISON, James, David
39 Sandown Crescent, Sandiway
Northwich, Cheshire CW8 2QN / GB
 [2002/23]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Powell, Timothy John, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date00956729.804.09.2000
[2002/23]
WO2000GB03390
Priority number, dateGB1999002094506.09.1999         Original published format: GB 9920945
[2002/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0117647
Date:15.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1210161
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1210161
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:B01D11/02
[2002/23]
CPC:
B01D3/40 (EP,US); B01D1/2846 (EP,US); B01D11/028 (EP,US);
B01D11/0488 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/50]
Former [2002/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:APPARAT UND METHODE ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON BIOMASSE[2002/23]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING BIOMASS[2002/23]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION DE BIOMASSE[2002/23]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2002National basic fee paid 
12.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
22.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2003Fee for grant paid
23.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2004
FI04.09.2004
LU04.09.2004
PT04.09.2004
SE05.09.2004
IE06.09.2004
[2008/29]
Former [2007/08]AT04.09.2004
FI04.09.2004
LU04.09.2004
SE05.09.2004
IE06.09.2004
Former [2006/13]AT04.09.2004
FI04.09.2004
SE05.09.2004
IE06.09.2004
Former [2005/46]FI04.09.2004
SE05.09.2004
IE06.09.2004
Former [2005/24]FI04.09.2004
SE05.09.2004
Former [2005/23]SE05.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH01104303  ;
 [A]JPS62197103  ;
 [A]JPH0760002  ;
 [XA]US1463154  (CUMMINS EARL H) [X] 1,2,19,20,23-25 * the whole document * [A] 6,17
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890724), vol. 13, no. 326, & JP01104303 A 19890421 (OGAWA KORYO KK) [X] 1,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880216), vol. 12, no. 50, & JP62197103 A 19870831 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 6, & JP07060002 A 19950307 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1,3-5,7,9,12-14,17,19-21 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.