Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0222535 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0006206 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6673974 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP0006206 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5060700B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2012 | B2 | JPWO2002022535 | 22.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0006206 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1318134 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2006 | B1 | EP1318134 | 16.06.2004 | A4 | EP1318134 | 11.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0006206 | 11.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60027210T | 28.12.2006 | T2 | DE60027210D1 | 18.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP0006206 | 11.09.2000 |