Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318134

EP1318134 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1,1-BIS(4-HYDROXYPHENYL)-3,3,5-TRIMETHYLCYCLOHEXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONSHU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
1-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
HONSHU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD.
1-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Honshu Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
1-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAO, Kazuhiko, Honshu Chemical Industry Co., Ltd
5-115, Kozaika 2-chome
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-0007 / JP
02 / EKAWA, Kenji, Honshu Chemical Industry Co., Ltd
5-115, Kozaika 2-chome
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-0007 / JP
03 / ISOTA, Yoichiro, Honshu Chemical Industry Co., Ltd
5-115, Kozaika 2-chome
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-0007 / JP
04 / NAKAGUCHI, Toru, Honshu Chemical Industry Co., Ltd
5-115, Kozaika 2-chome
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-0007 / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2003/24]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date00957102.711.09.2000
[2003/24]
WO2000JP06206
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222535
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318134
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318134
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07C39/17, C07C37/20, C07B61/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,1-BIS-(4-HYDROXYPHENYL)-3,3,5-TRIMETHYLCYCLOHEXAN[2003/24]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1,1-BIS(4-HYDROXYPHENYL)-3,3,5-TRIMETHYLCYCLOHEXANE[2003/24]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 1,1-BIS(4-HYDROXYPHENYL)-3,3,5-TRIMETHYLCYCLOHEXANE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2003Translation filed 
28.03.2003National basic fee paid 
28.03.2003Search fee paid 
28.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
28.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
29.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2006Fee for grant paid
30.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT05.04.2006
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[A]EP0995737  (HONSHU CHEMICAL IND [JP])