Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243042

EP1243042 - METHOD OF ACTIVATING METAL HYDRIDE MATERIAL AND ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.04.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.06.2010  [2010/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ovonic Battery Company, Inc.
1707 Northwood Dr.
Troy, MI 48084 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
OVONIC BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
1707 Northwood
Troy, MI 48084 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REICHMAN, Benjamin
3740 MacNichol Trail
West Bloomfield, MI 48323 / US
02 / MAYS, William
14850 Arcola
Livonia, MI 48154 / US
03 / FETCENKO, Michael, A.
429 Daylily Drive
Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Former [2002/39]Pautex Schneider, Nicole , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. 25 avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date00957526.718.08.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US22603
Priority number, dateUS1999039539113.09.1999         Original published format: US 395391
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0120697
Date:22.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243042
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.03.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/58, H01M10/26, C01B6/24
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG VON METALLHYDRIDMATERIAL UND ELEKTRODE[2002/39]
English:METHOD OF ACTIVATING METAL HYDRIDE MATERIAL AND ELECTRODE[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION D'HYDRURE METALLIQUE ET D'ELECTRODES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2002National basic fee paid 
13.03.2002Search fee paid 
13.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
01.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/22]
20.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5480741  (SAKAI TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-14,16-22 * column 4, line 36 - line 51 * * column 9, line 1 - line 12 * [A] 5,15,29-46;
 [X]US5943545  (ISE TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 5 - line 29 * * column 5, line 7 - line 14 *;
 [X]EP0791971  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 23-28 * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 4 *;
 [PX]  - CHEN J ET AL, "Mg2Ni-based hydrogen storage alloys for metal hydride electrodes", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19991220), vol. 293-295, ISSN 0925-8388, pages 675 - 679, XP004364703 [PX] 23-28 * Section 2 Experimental, Section 4 Conclusions, Table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-8388(99)00429-6
International search[A]US4716088  (REICHMAN BENJAMIN [US], et al);
 [AP]US6013390  (KIMIYA HIROKAZU [JP], et al);
 [A]US4728586  (VENKATESAN SRINI [US], et al)
by applicantUS5480741
 US5943545
 EP0791971