Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1228262

EP1228262 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF PLANE-PARALLEL WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weinert, Jasmin
Pienzenauerstrasse 129
81925 München / DE
[2002/32]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/32]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00958162.025.07.2000
[2002/32]
WO2000DE02419
Priority number, dateDE199914738601.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19947386
DE199915203228.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19952032
[2002/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0125500
Date:12.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1228262
Date:07.08.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001
[2002/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1228262
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/00, C09C1/00
[2002/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG PLANPARALLELER PLÄTTCHEN[2002/32]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF PLANE-PARALLEL WAFERS[2002/32]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PLAQUETTES A FACES PLANES ET PARALLELES[2002/32]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2002National basic fee paid 
12.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2003Fee for grant paid
03.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE04.06.2003
CY25.07.2003
LU25.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]IE04.06.2003
CY25.07.2003
LU25.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/36]IE04.06.2003
CY25.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/29]IE04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/15]IE04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/10]GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9965618  (CPSI INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS60155609  ;
 [DXA]US3123489  (R.A. BOLOMEY ET. AL.) [DX] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,9-16
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851218), vol. 009, no. 322, Database accession no. (M - 440), [A] 1-16 * abstract *