Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1207745

EP1207745 - GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE AND METHOD RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2016/25]
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Inventor(s)01 / RUDA, Fredrik
Odlingsvägen 18
S-147 50 Tumba / SE
 [2002/22]
Representative(s)Lilliehorn, Tobias
DeLaval International AB
Intellectual Property Support
Legal Affairs
P.O.Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2016/25]
Former [2014/37]Gray, Helen Mary
ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Former [2013/03]Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2011/44]Amery, Marcus James , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2011/42]Amery, Marcus James , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DE
Former [2010/46]Amery, Marcus James , et al
M James & Co 12 Deer Park Road
London SW19 3FB / GB
Former [2010/44]Amery, Marcus James , et al
Lombard Business Park 12 Deer Park Road
London SW19 3FB / GB
Former [2009/20]Amery, Marcus James , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2008/27]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2007/13]Kossmann, Jan Henrik
DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Former [2002/22]Estreen, Lars , et al
Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date00959089.431.08.2000
[2002/22]
WO2000SE01674
Priority number, dateSE1999000311203.09.1999         Original published format: SE 9903112
[2002/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0117336
Date:15.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1207745
Date:29.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001
[2002/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1207745
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1207745
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/007
[2002/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2016/25]
Former [2007/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2002/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:GRAPHISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE UND DAZUGEHÖRIGE METHODE[2002/22]
English:GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE AND METHOD RELATED THERETO[2002/22]
French:INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2002/22]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2002National basic fee paid 
16.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
16.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/22]
29.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2007Fee for grant paid
12.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2008  11.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Weverskade 110
3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL
Opponent's representative
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V., et al
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
 [2016/14]
Former [2008/09]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2008   
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Weverskade 110
3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL
Opponent's representative
Jennen, Peter Leonardus Hendricus, et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely NV Weverskade 110
3147 PA Maassluis / NL
14.03.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.07.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.05.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition15.08.2011Appeal received No.  T1715/11
26.10.2011Statement of grounds filed
22.07.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.08.2011Appeal received No.  T1715/11
26.10.2011Statement of grounds filed
22.07.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
22.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.07.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
CY11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
GB31.08.2007
IE31.08.2007
LU31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
PT11.09.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
CY11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
GB31.08.2007
IE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2009/03]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
GB31.08.2007
IE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/45]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
IE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/23]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
MC31.08.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/19]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT11.04.2007
BE11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT11.04.2007
CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2007/48]CH11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
LI11.04.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2007/47]ES22.07.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0440313  (MULTINORM BV [NL]);
 [A]US5198976  (FORM MICHAEL A [US], et al);
 [A]US5354439  (FORAT GERARD [FR], et al)
OppositionEP0626635
 WO9930277
 EP0565189
 WO9939567