Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1207745 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1207745



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 846
27.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
12.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
12.05.2016 French translation of claims Opposition 4
12.05.2016 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
04.05.2016 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
04.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Request for correction Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
30.03.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
30.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
03.03.2016 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
18.02.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
18.02.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
18.02.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.01.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.11.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
20.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.07.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.07.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.07.2015 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 12
23.06.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
23.06.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
05.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.05.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
29.05.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.05.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.04.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.03.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
24.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.03.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.08.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
18.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.07.2014 General authorisation Opposition 1
18.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
03.07.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
25.06.2014 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
27.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
27.05.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
27.05.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
27.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
14.12.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
22.11.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
22.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.05.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
22.03.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.03.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
09.03.2012 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
01.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.03.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.11.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.10.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
26.10.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
18.10.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.09.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
19.08.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.08.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.08.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
05.08.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.08.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.08.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
17.06.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
17.06.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.06.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
17.06.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.05.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.04.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.04.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.04.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.04.2011 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
25.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.03.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2010 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.10.2010 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
22.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.10.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
18.10.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.10.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
04.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
27.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
25.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.04.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 2
03.04.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
31.03.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
21.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
02.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
02.06.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
02.05.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
27.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.03.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
14.03.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.03.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.01.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
11.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.01.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.01.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.01.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
11.01.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
11.01.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.01.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
15.03.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.02.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
12.02.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.02.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.02.2007 General authorisation Search / examination 1
12.02.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
12.02.2007 Translation of priority document Search / examination 18
27.10.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.10.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.10.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
27.10.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
06.10.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
19.09.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.09.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
17.04.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.04.2002 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
16.04.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 5
16.02.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
17.12.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
17.12.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
08.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 20
23.03.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.03.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18