Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1200704

EP1200704 - THREADED PIPE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hunting Energy Services, L.P.
2 Northpoint Drive, Suite 500
Houston, TX 77060 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Hunting Energy Services, L.P.
2 Northpoint Drive, Suite 500
Houston, TX 77060 / US
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Hunting Oilfield Services, Inc.
15355 Vantage Parkway West, Suite 100
Houston, TX 77032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OLIVIER, Huey, P.
3817 Melancon Road
Broussard, LA 70518 / US
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Schwan - Schwan - Schorer
Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Elfenstrasse 32
81739 München / DE
Application number, filing date00959184.307.08.2000
[2002/18]
WO2000US21466
Priority number, dateUS1999037156210.08.1999         Original published format: US 371562
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0111182
Date:15.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1200704
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1200704
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/042, F16L15/06, F16L15/00
[2002/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBVERBINDUNG FÜR ROHRE[2002/18]
English:THREADED PIPE CONNECTION[2002/18]
French:RACCORD DE TUBE FILETE[2002/18]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2002National basic fee paid 
19.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.02.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2005Fee for grant paid
07.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.10.2005
BE26.10.2005
CH26.10.2005
CY26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
FR26.10.2005
IT26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/35]AT26.10.2005
BE26.10.2005
CH26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IT26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT26.10.2005
BE26.10.2005
CH26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT26.10.2005
BE26.10.2005
CH26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT26.10.2005
CH26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
LI26.10.2005
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI26.10.2005
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI26.10.2005
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI26.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US5154452  (JOHNSON) [A] 13,26 * column 8, line 13 - column 9, line 17; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5810401  (MOSING) [A] 1,12,14,18,19 * column 6, line 47 - line 64 *;
 [A]EP0713952  (SUMIMOTO METAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 12,13,26 * page 4, line 26 - line 32 * * page 5, line 29 - line 48 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 8; figures 4,8 *;
 [A]US4629222  (DEARDEN ET AL.) [A] 12,13 * figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0454148  (BAKER HUGHES INC.) [A] 13 * column 4, line 20 - line 38 *;
 [A]US3870351  (MATSUKI) [A] 1,12,14,18,19 * column 3, line 33 - line 57 *;
 [A]US4522431  (REIMERT) [A] 13 * figure 10 *;
 [A]GB2138089  (HUNTING OILFIELD SERVICES LTD) [A] 1,12,14,18,19 * abstract *