Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1210115

EP1210115 - DOSAGES FOR TREATMENT WITH ANTI-ErbB2 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/32]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAUGHMAN, Sharon, Ann
1050 Driftwood Lane
Ventura, CA 93001 / US
02 / SHAK, Steven
1133 Cambridge Road
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
 [2002/34]
Former [2002/23]01 / BAUGHMAN, Sharon, Ann
520 Keelson Circle
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
02 / SHAK, Steven
1133 Cambridge Road
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
Representative(s)Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00959423.525.08.2000
[2002/23]
WO2000US23391
Priority number, dateUS19990151018P27.08.1999         Original published format: US 151018 P
US20000213822P23.06.2000         Original published format: US 213822 P
[2002/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0115730
Date:08.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1210115
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001
[2002/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1210115
Date:05.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/32
[2009/11]
Former International [2002/23]A61K39/395, // C07K16:32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/23]
Extension statesAL20.03.2002
LT20.03.2002
LV20.03.2002
MK20.03.2002
RO20.03.2002
SI20.03.2002
TitleGerman:DOSIERUNG FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG MIT ANTI ERBB2-ANTIKÖRPERN[2002/23]
English:DOSAGES FOR TREATMENT WITH ANTI-ErbB2 ANTIBODIES[2002/23]
French:DOSAGES POUR TRAITEMENT AVEC DES ANTICORPS ANTI-ErbB2[2002/23]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2002National basic fee paid 
20.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
16.05.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
30.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2009Fee for grant paid
17.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.2016Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP09008313.0  / EP2111870
EP09008314.8  / EP2110138
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Brazell, Lorna Celia
Osborne Clarke
One London Wall
London
EC2Y 5EB / GB
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Brazell, Lorna Celia
Osborne Clarke
One London Wall
London
EC2Y 5EB / GB
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Brazell, Lorna Celia
Osborne Clarke
One London Wall
London
EC2Y 5EB / GB
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
Former [2012/04]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
 07  05.05.2010   
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
Former [2011/02]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010  20.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
Former [2010/24]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010  10.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
 02  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Stada R & D GmbH
Stadastrasse 2 - 18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Neuefeind, Regina, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 03  06.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Celltrion, Inc.
13-6 Songdo-dong
Incheon City 406 840 / KR
Opponent's representative
Kinkeldey, Daniela
Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14
80333 München / DE
 05  05.05.2010  12.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
 06  06.05.2010   
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Bird & Bird LLP Van Alkemadelaan 700
2597 AW Den Haag / NL
Former [2010/23]
Opponent(s)01  05.05.2010   
BioGeneriX AG
Janderstrasse 3
68199 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
14.06.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.12.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.05.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
25.10.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/42]
Appeal following opposition06.07.2012Appeal received No.  T1592/12
13.09.2012Statement of grounds filed
25.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
25.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:20.04.2007Request for further processing filed
20.04.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.05.2007Decision despatched
17.05.2005Request for further processing filed
17.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.05.2005Decision despatched
02.10.2003Request for further processing filed
02.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH05.08.2009
LI05.08.2009
[2017/51]
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9931140  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-105 * page 1, line 19 - page 4, line 19 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 33 * * page 24, line 14 - page 27, line 3 *;
 [X]WO9817797  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-105 * page 32, line 31 - page 33, line 37 * * page 36, line 7 - page 37, line 25 *
 [X]  - PEGRAM MARK D ET AL, "Phase II study of receptor-enhanced chemosensitivity using recombinant humanized anti-p185HER2/neu monoclonal antibody plus cisplatin in patients with HER2/neu-overexpressing metastatic breast cancer refractory to chemotherapy treatment.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (199808), vol. 16, no. 8, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 2659 - 2671, XP000971446 [X] 1-105 * abstract * * page 2660, column 2, paragraph L - page 2661, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2669, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - GOLDENBERG M M, "Trastuzumab, a recombinant DNA-derived humanized monoclonal antibody, a novel agent for the treatment of metastatic breast cancer", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS,EXCERPTA MEDICA, PRINCETON, NJ,US, (1999), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 309 - 318, XP000918210 [X] 1-105 * page 311, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 313, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 314, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-2918(00)88288-0
ExaminationWO0100245
 US5055393
    - PEDLEY R.B., "Pharmacokinetics of monoclonal antibodies. Implications for their use in cancer therapy", CLINICAL IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL, AUCKLAND, NZ, (19960101), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 54 - 67, XP009100791
    - REILLY R.M. ET AL, "Problems of delivery of monoclonal antibodies. Pharmaceutical and pharmacokinetic solutions", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD., AUCKLAND, NZ, (19950101), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 126 - 142, XP009100787

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003088-199528020-00004
    - SHARIFI J. ET AL, "Improving monoclonal antibody pharmacokinetics via chemical modification", QUARTERLY JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, MILAN, IT, (19980101), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 242 - 249, XP009100792
by applicant   - WALDMANN TA; STROBER W., "Metabolism of immunoglobulins", PROG ALLERGY, (1969), vol. 13, pages 29 - 31
    - WALDMANN TA; STROBER W., "Metabolism of immunoglobulins", PROG ALLERGY, (1965), vol. 13, no. 29-31, page 30