Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240013

EP1240013 - COMPOSITE EXPANSION JOINT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Textiles Coated Incorporated
105 Route 101A
Amherst, NH 03031-0532 / US
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / TIPPETT, Stephen, W.
115 Meetinghouse Hill Road
New Boston, NH 03070 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Blake, John Henry Francis
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Blake, John Henry Francis
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date00959707.131.08.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US23987
Priority number, dateUS1999039662115.09.1999         Original published format: US 396621
US2000055218218.04.2000         Original published format: US 552182
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0119610
Date:22.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240013
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240013
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/12, F16L59/02, B32B31/20, D06N3/04
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/33]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEHNUNGSFUGEN-VERBUNDMATERIAL[2002/38]
English:COMPOSITE EXPANSION JOINT MATERIAL[2002/38]
French:MATERIAU POUR JOINT DE DILATATION COMPOSITE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2002National basic fee paid 
12.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
19.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2003Fee for grant paid
11.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5368923  (TIPPETT STEPHEN W [US]) [DA] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5496628  (RIBBANS ROBERT C [US]) [DA] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9008034  (TIPPETT STEPHEN W [US]) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4732413  (BACHMANN LOTHAR [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4165404  (QUEHL HENRY E) [A] 1-42 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 51; example -; claim - *