Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315615

EP1315615 - MULTI-LAYER FILMS HAVING AT LEAST THREE BIAS-CUT LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.02.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview
Illinois 60025 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARNES, Christopher, C., E.
15611 Tumbling Rapids Drive
Houston, TX 77084 / US
02 / AMENDT, Charles, E.
11715 Bexhell Drive
Houston, TX 77065 / US
03 / NIMZ, Steven, S.
7825 Alva Lake Road
Lake Tomahawk, WI 54539 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2003/23]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date00959957.207.09.2000
[2003/23]
WO2000US24479
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220264
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315615
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315615
Date:22.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B32B7/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MINDESTENS DREI SCHRÄG GESCHNITTENE SCHICHTEN ENTHALTENDE MEHRSCHICHTFOLIEN[2003/23]
English:MULTI-LAYER FILMS HAVING AT LEAST THREE BIAS-CUT LAYERS[2003/23]
French:FILMS MULTICOUCHE PRESENTANT AU MOINS TROIS COUCHES A COUPE ECHELONNEE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2003National basic fee paid 
25.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
15.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
25.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
02.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2009Fee for grant paid
06.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.01.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.04.2009
DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
IT22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
GR23.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
IE07.09.2009
LU07.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/21]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
IT22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
GR23.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
IE07.09.2009
LU07.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/14]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
IT22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
GR23.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
IE07.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/46]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
GR23.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
IE07.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/35]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
IE07.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/08]DK22.04.2009
FI22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
Former [2009/52]FI22.04.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
Former [2009/49]FI22.04.2009
ES02.08.2009
PT22.08.2009
Former [2009/46]ES02.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US3322613  (OLE-BENDT RASMUSSEN) [A] 1-3,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4279957  (HIRAOKA TAKAYUKI, et al) [A] 1-3,11 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 28 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 5; example 1 *
ExaminationWO0196102
 GB1526722