Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242619

EP1242619 - ASSAY FOR DETECTION OF HUMAN CFTR ALLELE VARIANTS USING SPECIFIC DIAGNOSTIC PRIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BAYLIFFE, Andrew, Iain
Alderly Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
02 / DOCTER, Eelco
Alderly Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
03 / KELLY, Stephen, James
Alderly Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
04 / ROBERTSON, Nancy, Hastings
Alderly Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Simino, Massimo , et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners
Piazza S. Babila 5
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Simino, Massimo , et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00960854.819.09.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000GB03597
Priority number, dateGB1999002252724.09.1999         Original published format: GB 9922527
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0121833
Date:29.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242619
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION HUMANER CFTR ALLELVARIANTEN MITTELS SPEZIFISCHER DIAGNOSTISCHER PRIMER[2002/39]
English:ASSAY FOR DETECTION OF HUMAN CFTR ALLELE VARIANTS USING SPECIFIC DIAGNOSTIC PRIMERS[2002/39]
French:METHODE DE DETECTION DES VARIANTS ALLELIQUES DU CFTR HUMAIN UTILISANT DES AMORCES DIGNOSTIQUES SPECIFIQUES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2002National basic fee paid 
11.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
01.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/41]
10.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200203   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2002
30.09.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0928832  (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [X] 15-30 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]WO9742345  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15-30 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]EP0497527  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 15-30 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]US5853989  (JEFFREYS ALEC JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 15-30 * example 15 * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]WO9318177  (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 15-30 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]  - FRIEDMAN K ET AL, "Rapid characterization of the variable length Polythymidine Tract in the Cystic Fibrosis gene (CFTR)", HUMAN MUTATION, (1997), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 108 - 15, XP001053200 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-1004(1997)10:2<108::AID-HUMU3>3.0.CO;2-G
 [Y]  - COHEN J ET AL, "Relation between mutations of the Cystic Fibrosis Gene and idiopathic pancreatitis", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (199809), vol. 339, no. 10, pages 653 - 58, XP001053192 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199809033391002
 [Y]  - BRAUN A ET AL, "DETECTING CFTR GENE MUTATIONS BY USING PRIMER OLIGO BASE EXTENSION AND MASS SPECTROMETRY", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, (1997), vol. 43, no. 7, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1151 - 1158, XP001019094 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MAK V ET AL, "Proportion of cystic fibrosis gene mutations not detected by routine testing in men with Obstructive Azoospermia", JAMA, (199906), vol. 281, no. 23, pages 2217 - 24, XP001053208 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.281.23.2217
 [Y]  - SHARER N ET AL, "Mutations of the cystic fibrosis gene in patients with chronic pancreatitis", THE NEW JOURNAL OF ENGLAND MEDICINE, (19980903), vol. 339, no. 10, pages 645 - 52, XP001053194 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199809033391001
 [Y]  - HABER P ET AL, "Alcoholic Pancreatitis and polymorphisms of the variable length tract in the cystic fibrosis gene", ALCOHOLISM: CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RESEARCH, (199903), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 509 - 12, XP001053196 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000374-199903000-00019
 [Y]  - GELFI C ET AL, "Rapid capillary zone electrophoresis in isoelectric histidine buffer: high resolution of the poly-T tract allelic variants in intron 8 of the CFTR gene", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 906 - 13, XP002188788 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FRIEDMAM K ET AL, "Cystic fibrosis syndrome: A new paradigm for inherited disorders and implications for molecular diagnosis", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 45, no. 7, page 92931, XP002188789