Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1142720

EP1142720 - METHOD FOR ARRANGING SELF-SCANNING LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT ARRAY CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Change - representativepublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHNO, Seiji, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Wilson Gunn
5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester
M3 2JA / GB
Former [2001/41]Robey, James Edward , et al
41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street
Manchester M2 7BD / GB
Application number, filing date00961048.618.09.2000
[2001/41]
WO2000JP06345
Priority number, dateJP1999026687221.09.1999         Original published format: JP 26687299
[2001/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0121410
Date:29.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1142720
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001
[2001/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.03.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/44, B41J2/45, B41J2/455, H01L33/00, H01L25/04, H01L27/15, H01L25/18
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINES CHIPS FÜR EINE MATRIX VON SELBSTABTASTENDEN LICHTEMITTIERENDEN ELEMENTEN[2001/41]
English:METHOD FOR ARRANGING SELF-SCANNING LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT ARRAY CHIP[2001/41]
French:TECHNIQUE D'AGENCEMENT DE PUCES A ELEMENTS LUMINESCENTS A AUTO-BALAYAGE[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2001Translation filed 
13.06.2001National basic fee paid 
13.06.2001Search fee paid 
13.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/32]
15.07.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[XP]JP2000168126  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08216448  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH09283807  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0999583  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD);
 [A]JPH09283808  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
by applicantJPH08216448