EP1218336 - MELANIN CONCENTRATING HORMONE ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2005/04] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kaneyoshi 2-40, Maruyamadai 2-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0152 / JP | 02 /
TERAUCHI, Jun 3-5-204, Hachizuka 3-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0024 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Masaaki 8-5, Kasuga 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Nobuhiro 6-51, Fushiharacho, Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8031 / JP | 05 /
SHIMOMURA, Yukio 12-1-410, Matsushiro 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP | 06 /
TAKEKAWA, Shiro 12-8-508, Miyanishicho, Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0976 / JP | 07 /
ISHIHARA, Yuji 3-8, Yamada 3-chome, Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0874 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2002/27] | Lewin, John Harvey Takeda Patent Office, 11-12 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00961075.9 | 19.09.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000JP06375 | Priority number, date | JP19990266298 | 20.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26629899 | JP19990357889 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35788999 | JP20000126272 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126272 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0121577 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1218336 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C235/42, C07C235/50, C07C235/56, C07C235/64, C07C235/84 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
C07D207/277 (EP,US);
C07C217/74 (EP,US);
C07C219/28 (EP,US);
C07C233/29 (EP,US);
C07C233/44 (EP,US);
C07C233/80 (EP,US);
C07C235/42 (EP,US);
C07C235/50 (EP,US);
C07C235/56 (EP,US);
C07C235/64 (EP,US);
C07C235/84 (EP,US);
C07C237/40 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C275/42 (EP,US);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
C07D209/18 (EP,US);
C07D209/22 (EP,US);
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07D211/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/18 (EP,US);
C07D211/22 (EP,US);
C07D211/26 (EP,US);
C07D211/32 (EP,US);
C07D211/52 (EP,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,US);
C07D211/70 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D215/14 (EP,US);
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
C07D233/24 (EP,US);
C07D239/28 (EP,US);
C07D239/30 (EP,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,US);
C07D263/14 (EP,US);
C07D263/34 (EP,US);
C07D265/28 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
C07D295/13 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D307/81 (EP,US);
C07D311/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D319/20 (EP,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,US);
C07D333/28 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D335/16 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US);
C07C2602/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | C07C235/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTAGONISTEN DES MELANIN-KONZENTRIERENDEN HORMONS | [2002/27] | English: | MELANIN CONCENTRATING HORMONE ANTAGONIST | [2002/27] | French: | ANTAGONISTE DE L'HORMONE DE CONCENTRATION DE LA MELANINE | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2009 | 16.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2108185 (TROPONWERKE DINKLAGE & CO.) [X] 1-4,8-16,18,28,32 * example -; claim - *; | [X]DE2448257 (TROPONWERKE DINKLAGE & CO) [X] 1-4,8-16 * example -; claim - *; | [X]DE2502588 (TROPONWERKE DINKLAGE & CO) [X] 1-4,8-16 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]EP0533266 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [XD] 1,4,5,7,9,10,13-16 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO9532967 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-5,7,13-16 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO9635671 (PFIZER [US], et al) [XD] 1,4,7,13-16,36,38 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9838156 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-16 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9901127 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-16,18,29,32 * example -; claim 4 *; | [X]EP0920864 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7,13-17,35-38 * page 3, line 10-14, 30-36; claims; examples *; | [X] - R. E. MEWSHAW ET AL., "New Generation Dopaminergic Agents. 1. Discovery of a Novel Scaffold Which Embraces the D2 Agonist Pharmacophore. Structure-Activity Relationship of a Series of 2-(Aminomethyl)chromans", J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, no. 26, pages 4235 - 56, XP002155829 [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13 * page 4248, right column, example 22b - page 4249, left column, example 39a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9703653 | [X] - A. M. BIRCH ET AL., "N-Substituted (2,3-Dihydro-1,4-benzodioxin-2-yl)methylamine Derivatives as D2 Antagonists/5-HT1A Partial Agonists with Potential as Atypical Antipsychotic Agents", J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, no. 17, pages 3342 - 55, XP002155830 [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13 * scheme 8 compound 49 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9910122 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Informationssysteme, XP002155831 [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13 * see BRN 5345411 * | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1992), vol. 5, pages 531 - 32 | [A] - QU D ET AL, "A ROLE FOR MELANIN-CONCENTRATING HORMONE IN THE CENTRAL REGULATION OF FEEDING BEHAVIOUR", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, (19960321), vol. 380, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 243 - 247, XP002037981 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/380243a0 |