Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321858

EP1321858 - GENE DATA DISPLAYING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.12.2008  [2008/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HITACHI SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Hitachi Software Engineering Co., Ltd.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOZAKI, Y., Hitachi Software Engineering Co., Ltd.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
02 / NAKASHIGE, R., Hitachi Software Engineering Co Ltd
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
03 / TAMURA, T., Hitachi Software Engineering Co., Ltd.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00961085.819.09.2000
[2003/26]
WO2000JP06385
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0225489
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321858
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F19/00, G01N33/50, C12N15/11
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/26]
TitleGerman:GENDATENANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2003/26]
English:GENE DATA DISPLAYING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2003/26]
French:TECHNIQUE D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNEES GENETIQUES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT A CET EFFET[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2002Translation filed 
13.05.2002National basic fee paid 
13.05.2002Search fee paid 
13.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2002Examination requested  [2003/26]
24.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/51]
07.05.2008Date of oral proceedings
04.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/51]
04.08.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ROSS D T ET AL, "SYSTEMATIC VARIATION IN GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS IN HUMAN CANCER CELL CEL LINES", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200003), vol. 24, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 227 - 235, XP002933374 [X] 1-10 * page 227 - page 235; figures 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73432
 [X]  - SCHLUTER S F ET AL, "Molecular origins and evolution of immunoglobulin heavy-chain genes of jawed vertebrates", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (199711), vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 543 - 549, XP004093521 [X] 1-10 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(97)01153-5
 [A]  - LUDWIG AND O STRUNK W, "ARB: A Software Environment for Sequence Data", TU MUNICH, (19970416), XP002180560 [A] 1-10 * pages 9,21-24 *
 [A]  - LICHTARGE O ET AL, "Identification of functional surfaces of the zinc binding domains of intracellular receptors", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19971205), vol. 274, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 325 - 337, XP004451567 [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1997.1395
International search[Y]US5598350  (KAWANISHI YUICHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]  - ROSS D.T. ET AL., "Systematic variation in gene expression patterns in human cancer cell lines", NATURE GENETICS, (20000310), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 227 - 235, XP002933374

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73432