EP1221053 - A METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF PROSTATIC EPITHELIAL CELLS FROM SEMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bander, Neil H. 2 Hemlock Hills Chappaqua, NY 10514 / US | [2002/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2002/28] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00961585.7 | 06.09.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000US24443 | Priority number, date | US19990153506P | 13.09.1999 Original published format: US 153506 P | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0119956 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221053 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/567, G01N33/574, C12N5/06, C12N5/08, C12N11/14 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/56966 (EP,US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON PROSTATISCHEN EPITHELZELLEN AUS SPERMA | [2002/28] | English: | A METHOD FOR ISOLATION OF PROSTATIC EPITHELIAL CELLS FROM SEMEN | [2002/28] | French: | PROCEDE D'ISOLEMENT DE CELLULES EPITHELIALES PROSTATIQUES DU SPERME | [2002/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/35] | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY] - LIU H ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO THE EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN OF PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN ALSO REACT WITH TUMOR VASCULAR ENDOTHELIUM", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970901), vol. 57, no. 17, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3629 - 3634, XP001080132 [DY] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - MARTIN V M ET AL, "IMMUNOMAGNETIC ENRICHMENT OF DISSEMINATED EPITHELIAL TUMOR CELLS FROM PERIPHERAL BLOOD BY MACS", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199803), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0301-472X, pages 252 - 264, XP001030706 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [DA] - MILTENYI S ET AL, "HIGH GRADIENT MAGNETIC CELL SEPERATION WITH MACS", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (1990), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 231 - 238, XP000999711 [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990110203 | [DA] - BOSTWICK DAVID G ET AL, "Prostate specific membrane antigen expression in prostatic intraepithelial neoplasia and adenocarcinoma: A study of 184 cases", CANCER, (19980601), vol. 82, no. 11, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 2256 - 2261, XP002302396 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19980601)82:11<2256::AID-CNCR22>3.0.CO;2-S | [DA] - BARREN R J ET AL, "Method for Identifying Prostate Cells in Semen Using Flow Cytometry", PROSTATE, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980801), vol. 36, ISSN 0270-4137, pages 181 - 188, XP002172823 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0045(19980801)36:3<181::AID-PROS6>3.0.CO;2-K | International search | [Y]US5489525 (PASTAN IRA H [US]); | [Y]US5538866 (ISRAELI RON S [US], et al); | [Y]WO9803873 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [Y]WO9735616 (PACIFIC NORTHWEST CANCER FOUND [US]); | [Y] - GRIWATZ ET AL., "An immunological enrichment method for epithelial cells from peripheral blood", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (199503), vol. 183, pages 251 - 265, XP002938752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(95)00063-G | [Y] - MARTIN ET AL., "Enrichment of epithelial tumor cells from peripheral blood and bone marrow of carcinoma patients by high gradient magnetic cell sorting (MACS)", PROC. AMER. ASSN. FOR CANCER RES. ANN. MTG., (199703), vol. 38, page 492, XP002938753 |