blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1224273 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1224273



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3317
22.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.03.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
10.03.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
17.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.02.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
25.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.01.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.01.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.01.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
17.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.10.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
31.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
29.09.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.09.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.04.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 6
21.05.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
21.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
08.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
18.12.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
13.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
02.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
28.09.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
22.03.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
08.03.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
08.03.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
08.03.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
08.03.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
08.03.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
23.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
24.01.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Claims Appeal 5
13.01.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
12.01.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 60
09.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
03.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
29.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.10.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
28.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
28.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 201
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 153
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 76
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 153
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 201
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 76
28.10.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
26.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
26.10.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
25.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.10.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.10.2010 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
25.10.2010 Reply to appeal Appeal 17
21.10.2010 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
19.10.2010 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
30.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
27.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.08.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.06.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
10.06.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 62
08.06.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 63
06.05.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.04.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
09.04.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.04.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 31
02.02.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
12.11.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2009 Claims Opposition 4
11.11.2009 Claims Opposition 4
11.11.2009 Claims Opposition 4
11.11.2009 Claims Opposition 4
11.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
11.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
09.11.2009 Claims Opposition 16
09.11.2009 Drawings Opposition 4
09.11.2009 Drawings Opposition 26
09.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
09.11.2009 Priority document Opposition 12
07.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.08.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
07.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
25.06.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.06.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Claims Opposition 4
09.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
15.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
12.12.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.12.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
18.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
21.08.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.08.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.08.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.08.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.07.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
21.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 99
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
21.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
17.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 17
17.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
17.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
17.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.07.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 99
17.07.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
16.07.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 14
16.07.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.09.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.09.2007 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
12.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
19.07.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
19.07.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
11.10.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
11.10.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
11.10.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
11.10.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2006 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
07.06.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.06.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
29.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 7
29.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 7
29.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 20
09.07.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.07.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.07.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.04.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
18.01.2002 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
18.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
08.01.2002 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.01.2002 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.01.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2002 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
08.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
08.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.11.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
06.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
06.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.11.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.09.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.09.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.09.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 46
10.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 46
30.04.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.04.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.04.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.04.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
12.04.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 57
06.04.2001 Copy of the international search report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.04.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.01.2001 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
12.10.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.10.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 6
12.10.2000 Description International Searching Authority 50
12.10.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 3