Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236253

EP1236253 - ELECTRICAL FUNCTIONAL DEVICE, ESPECIALLY A SAFETY SWITCH FOR USE IN FIELD OF AVIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH
Industriestrasse 2-8
D-90518 Altdorf / DE
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MECKLER, Peter
Mittelweg 30a
91224 Hohenstadt/Pommelsbrunn / DE
02 / ELLENBERGER, Horst
Ernhofer Weg 2
90518 Altdorf / DE
03 / SCHNEIDER, Ewald
Espanstrasse 23a
91238 Offenhausen / DE
04 / HOFMEISTER, Lothar
Annemonenstrasse 10
92318 Neumarkt/Opf. / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte
Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[2002/36]
Application number, filing date00962391.926.08.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP08336
Priority number, dateDE199915933909.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19959339
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143247
Date:14.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236253
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236253
Date:12.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02B1/044
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES FUNKTIONSGERÄT, INSBESONDERE SCHUTZSCHALTER, ZUM EINSATZ IN DER LUFTFAHRT[2002/36]
English:ELECTRICAL FUNCTIONAL DEVICE, ESPECIALLY A SAFETY SWITCH FOR USE IN FIELD OF AVIATION[2002/36]
French:APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE FONCTIONNEL, EN PARTICULIER COMMUTATEUR DE SECURITE, DESTINE A ETRE EMPLOYE EN AERONAUTIQUE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2002National basic fee paid 
25.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
21.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2003Fee for grant paid
14.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
IT12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
PT12.04.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
IT12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
Former [2007/08]CY12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
Former [2004/41]FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
Former [2004/40]FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
Former [2004/33]FI12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI12.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE4040481  (KAPFER KARL) [X] 1 * column 2, line 63 - line 67 * * column 3, line 1 - line 19 * * column 4, line 18 - line 29 * [A] 1-3,6;
 [A]US3500282  (SLAGG JAMES E) [A] 4,5 * column 3, line 73 - column 4, line 23 *