Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236138

EP1236138 - A METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT QUESTIONNAIRE BASED SURVEY IN CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM, A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM AND A BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oy Riddes Ltd
Eurocity Joukahaisenkatu 1
20520 Turku / FI
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / AARNIO, Leila
Nahkurinpiha 3 as. 5
FIN-20100 Turku / FI
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Suominen, Kaisa Liisa , et al
Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy
P.O.Box 99
20521 Turku / FI
[N/P]
Former [2006/28]Suominen, Kaisa Liisa , et al
Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O.Box 99
20521 Turku / FI
Former [2002/36]Heikkilä, Hannes Antero
Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99
20521 Turku / FI
Application number, filing date00962573.202.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000FI00847
Priority number, dateFI1999000210030.09.1999         Original published format: FI 992100
FI1999000210130.09.1999         Original published format: FI 992101
FI1999000210230.09.1999         Original published format: FI 992102
[2002/36]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0124078
Date:05.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236138
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, H04M1/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesAL09.04.2002
LT09.04.2002
LV09.04.2002
MK09.04.2002
RO09.04.2002
SI09.04.2002
TitleGerman:MOBILFUNKSYSTEM, BASISSTATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINER AUF FRAGEBOGEN BASIERENDEN UMFRAGE IN EINEM SOLCHEN SYSTEM[2002/36]
English:A METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT QUESTIONNAIRE BASED SURVEY IN CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM, A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM AND A BASE STATION[2002/36]
French:PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'ENQUETE BASEE SUR QUESTIONNAIRE DANS UN SYSTEME RADIO CELLULAIRE, SYSTEME RADIO CELLULAIRE ET STATION DE BASE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2000Translation filed 
09.04.2002National basic fee paid 
09.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
12.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
16.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/34]
04.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US5842195  (PETERS GRAHAM [AU], et al);
 [A]WO9515065  (BELLSOUTH INT INC [US]);
 [A]US5496175  (OYAMA HIROAKI [JP], et al)