Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320810

EP1320810 - INTEGRATION OF DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Performix Research Limited
9 Hanover Street East
Dublin 2 / IE
[2006/10]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Performix Research Limited
The Warehouse, 35 Barrow Street
Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / MCGLOIN, Cathal
The Warehouse, 35 Barrow Street
Dublin 4 / IE
02 / MCGLOIN, Raymond
The Warehouse, 35 Barrow Street
Dublin 4 / IE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Former [2003/26]Weldon, Michael James , et al
c/o John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue
Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE
Application number, filing date00962779.529.09.2000
[2003/26]
WO2000IE00112
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0229631
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320810
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320810
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRATION VON DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEMEN[2003/26]
English:INTEGRATION OF DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS[2003/26]
French:INTEGRATION DE SYSTEMES DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2003National basic fee paid 
21.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
06.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2005Fee for grant paid
10.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05075788.9  / EP1605372
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
FR06.04.2005
IT06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
CY29.09.2005
GB29.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
IT06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
CY29.09.2005
GB29.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
FR30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2007/35]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
IT06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
CY29.09.2005
GB29.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2007/20]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
CY29.09.2005
GB29.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2007/08]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
GB29.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/40]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
IE29.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/35]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5806066  (GOLSHANI FOROUZAN [US], et al) [X] 1,14-23 * abstract * * column 2, lines 20-49 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 18 * [A] 2-13;
 [A]US5560005  (HOOVER MICHAEL K [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 56 * * column 11, lines 22-67 *;
 [A]WO0013112  (CABLETRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 32 *