Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235581

EP1235581 - USE OF RIBOSE TO PREVENT CRAMPING AND SORENESS IN MUSCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.09.2015  [2015/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bioenergy Inc.
13840 Johnson Street, Northeast
Ham Lake, MN 55304 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / BUTLER, Terri
6211 105th Avenue N.E.
Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US
02 / ST. CYR, John
12683 Drake Street N.W.
Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date00963748.922.09.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US26140
Priority number, dateUS1999040546424.09.1999         Original published format: US 405464
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0120969
Date:29.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235581
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235581
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/704, A61P21/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL05.04.2002
LT05.04.2002
LV05.04.2002
MK05.04.2002
RO05.04.2002
SI05.04.2002
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON RIBOSE ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON KRÄMPFEN UND MUSKELKATER[2002/36]
English:USE OF RIBOSE TO PREVENT CRAMPING AND SORENESS IN MUSCLES[2002/36]
French:UTILISATION DE LA RIBOSE EN PREVENTION DES CRAMPES ET DOULEURS MUSCULAIRES[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2002National basic fee paid 
05.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.04.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
30.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2006Fee for grant paid
12.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200203   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003
30.09.200304   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2004
30.09.200405   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
CY05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
LU22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2015/37]
Former [2009/03]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
CY05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
LU22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/36]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
LU22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/19]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
GR06.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/45]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/42]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
IE22.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/37]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/35]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
IT05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/13]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/09]AT05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/08]AT05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/51]FI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE05.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9965476  (BIOENERGY INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 11; examples 1-7; claims 1-16 *;
 [X]WO9215311  (DEPHA TEAM SRL [IT]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 3, paragraph 2; examples 1-6; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0894439  (CERESTAR HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, column 4, line 17 - page 8, column 2, line 12; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]  - PATTEN B M, "BENEFICIAL EFFECT OF D RIBOSE IN PATIENT WITH MYO ADENYLATE DEAMINASE DEFICIENCY.", LANCET, (1982) 1 (8280), 1071., XP001050584 [X] 1-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(82)92124-9
 [X]  - PORSCHKE H., "[Recent developments in the therapy of myopathies]. NEUERE ENTWICKLUNGEN IN DER THERAPIE DER MYOPATHIEN.", NERVENHEILKUNDE, (1994) 13/5 (257-263)., XP001051001 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 260, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 261, column 1, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - TULLSON P C ET AL, "ADENINE NUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS IN EXERCISING AND ENDURANCE-TRAINED SKELETAL MUSCLE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 261, no. 2 PART 1, ISSN 0002-9513, pages C342 - C347, XP001051003 [X] 1-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - WAGNER D R ET AL, "EFFECTS OF ORAL RIBOSE ON MUSCLE METABOLISM DURING BICYCLE ERGOMETER IN AMPD-DEFICIENT PATIENTS", ANNALS OF NUTRITION AND METABOLISM, KARGER, CH, (1991), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0373-0101, pages 297 - 302, XP000856782 [X] 1-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - ZOELLER N ET AL, "MYOADENYLATE DEAMINASE DEFICIENCY SUCCESSFUL SYMPTOMATIC THERAPY BY HIGH DOSE ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF RIBOSE", KLINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, (1986), vol. 64, no. 24, ISSN 0023-2173, pages 1281 - 1290, XP001051006 [X] 1-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01785710
Examination   - KUWABARAT T.; YUSA T.; MIYATAKE T., "Phosphorus 31-NMR studies on an animal model of human defective muscle glycolysis", DATABASE BIOSIS, (1986),