Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1146273

EP1146273 - PIPE FOR HOT-WATER CIRCULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 10.10.2012  [2012/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KURARAY CO., LTD.
1621 Sakazu
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP
[2009/08]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Kuraray Co., Ltd.
1621 Sakazu
Kurashiki-City, Okayama 710-8622 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMO, Hiroyuki
Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu
Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Takashi Kuraray Co., Ltd.
41, Miyukigaoka
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP
 [2001/42]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/42]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00964704.105.10.2000
[2001/42]
WO2000JP06968
Priority number, dateJP1999028878208.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28878299
[2001/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0127515
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1146273
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2001/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1146273
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.04.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:F16L9/12, B32B1/08, B32B27/28
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/42]
TitleGerman:ROHR FÜR HEISSWASSERZIRKULATION[2009/08]
English:PIPE FOR HOT-WATER CIRCULATION[2001/42]
French:TUYAU POUR CIRCULATION D'EAU CHAUDE[2001/42]
Former [2001/42]ROHR FÜR HEISSWASSERUMWÄLZUNG
Entry into regional phase05.10.2000Translation filed 
06.07.2001National basic fee paid 
06.07.2001Search fee paid 
06.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
28.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2008Fee for grant paid
23.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
GR19.05.2009
PT18.07.2009
IE05.10.2009
LU05.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2012/41]
Former [2011/45]AT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
GR19.05.2009
IE05.10.2009
LU05.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
GR19.05.2009
IE05.10.2009
LU05.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
GR19.05.2009
IE05.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/25]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
Former [2009/37]FI18.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH10230555  ;
 [A]EP0814126  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5034253  (MIYAKE SHINGI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 45, Database accession no. 1998-524879, XP002325665 & JPH10230555 A 19980902 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH10230555  (KURARAY CO);
 [Y]JPH1024505  (KURARAY CO)
by applicantJPS61140691
 JPH0274341
 JPH1024505
 JPH07331020
 JPH10230555