blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1216089 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1216089



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 272
25.04.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
21.03.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.2006 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
17.03.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.01.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.01.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
16.01.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
21.09.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
21.09.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
09.09.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
12.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 6
12.10.2004 Description Search / examination 16
12.10.2004 Drawings Search / examination 1
12.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.09.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.05.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 4
25.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
25.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.05.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.05.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
17.04.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.12.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.12.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
21.08.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.08.2001 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 4
09.07.2001 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.05.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.05.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
26.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 28
26.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 24
12.04.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.03.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 25
16.10.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.10.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 4
16.10.2000 Description International Searching Authority 15
16.10.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
16.10.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 5