blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1216089


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2007 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.11.2007  [2007/45]
27.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2007  [2007/35]
27.04.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.05.2007  [2007/22]
19.05.2006 (Expected) grant published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
26.04.2006 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.10.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.09.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.03.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.10.2003 Deletion: Reply to examination report
02.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2003 Change - applicant published on  02.07.2003  [2003/27]
07.03.2003 Examination report or reply
20.11.2002 Change - extension states
11.10.2002 Examination report or reply
11.10.2002 First examination report
02.10.2002 Renewal fee
09.05.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]
09.05.2002 Request for examination filed published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]
03.05.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
06.06.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2000 PCT data prior to European publication