blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1216089 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00965020 EP00965123 EP00966716



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0119504Global Dossier 02.08.2001A3
WO0119504 22.03.2001A2
Priority number Date
US15456499 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0119502Global Dossier 09.08.2001A3
WO0119502 22.03.2001A2
Priority number Date
US15456599 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7732623Global Dossier 08.06.2010B2
US2008287691 20.11.2008A1
Priority number Date
US16615299 17.11.1999
US21811408 11.07.2008
US71435100 16.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003509232Global Dossier 11.03.2003A
Priority number Date
US0025248 14.09.2000
US16615299 17.11.1999
US15463099 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1214141Global Dossier 04.08.2004B1
EP1214141 19.06.2002A2
Priority number Date
US0025047 13.09.2000
US15456499 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1214139Global Dossier 19.06.2002A2
Priority number Date
US0025585 18.09.2000
US15456599 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1216089Global Dossier 21.06.2006B1
EP1216089 26.06.2002A2
Priority number Date
US0025248 14.09.2000
US16615299 17.11.1999
US15463099 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60012758T 15.09.2005T2
DE60012758D 09.09.2004D1
Priority number Date
US0025047 13.09.2000
US15456499 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60028985T 15.02.2007T2
DE60028985D 03.08.2006D1
Priority number Date
US0025248 14.09.2000
US16615299 17.11.1999
US15463099 17.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6627291 30.09.2003B1
Priority number Date
US15456499 17.09.1999
US66110400 13.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7411075 12.08.2008B1
Priority number Date
US71435100 16.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003098121 29.05.2003A1
Priority number Date
US66192000 14.09.2000
US16615299 17.11.1999
US31478002 09.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003113528 19.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US66192000 14.09.2000
US31475602 09.12.2002
US15456499 17.09.1999
US15463099 17.09.1999
US15456599 17.09.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0119505Global Dossier 09.08.2001A3
WO0119505 22.03.2001A2
Priority number Date
US16615299 17.11.1999
US15463099 17.09.1999