blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1216089

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure16.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase17.04.2002National basic fee paid 
17.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted21.06.2006
Opposition procedure22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 30.05.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020417
 
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:27.11.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20021015
 
Event date:02.07.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:MILLIPORE CORPORATION
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:03.08.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60028985
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060803
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:19.01.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:30.05.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070322
 
Event date:27.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:EMD MILLIPORE CORPORATION
Effective DATE:20120327
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60028985 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE
 
Event date:02.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60028985 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:02.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60028985 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:EMD MILLIPORE CORPORATION, BILLERICA, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: MILLIPORE CORP., BEDFORD, MASS., US
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:02.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60028985 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER MBB, DE
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:16.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:10.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:13.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180919
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180813
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180904
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180912
Year of Fee Payment:19