Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1216089

EP1216089 - PATTERNED POROUS STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
290 Concord Road Billerica
Massachusetts 01821 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
290 Concord Road, Billerica
Massachusetts 01821 / US
Former [2003/27]For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
290 Concord Road
Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US
Former [2002/26]For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
80 Ashby Road
Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MOYA, Wilson
38 Hawthorne Village
Concord, MA 01742 / US
 [2002/26]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00965020.114.09.2000
[2002/26]
WO2000US25248
Priority number, dateUS19990154630P17.09.1999         Original published format: US 154630 P
US19990166152P17.11.1999         Original published format: US 166152 P
[2002/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0119505
Date:22.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1216089
Date:26.06.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1216089
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01D67/00
[2002/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEMUSTERTE PORÖSE STRUKTUREN[2002/26]
English:PATTERNED POROUS STRUCTURES[2002/26]
French:STRUCTURES POREUSES A MOTIFS[2002/26]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2002National basic fee paid 
17.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
15.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2006Fee for grant paid
16.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT21.06.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0272043  (PALL CORP) [X] 1-9 * column 8, line 41 - column 11, line 19 * * column 13, line 37 * * column 14, lines 1-30 * * column 15, lines 15-37 *;
 [X]FR2633398  (BIOKEMA SA) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]FR2233626  (GASBARRO LUCIANO) [X] 1-8 * page 3, lines 11-25 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 11 *;
 [X]WO9632635  (MEMTEC AMERICA CORP ;HODGES ALASTAIR MCINDOE (AU); JOHANSEN ODDVAR) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 46 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 4 * * page 11, lines 8-12; figures 6-8 *;
 [X]US5370836  (YOKOYAMA TAKASHI ET AL) [X] 1-8 * column 2, lines 53-66 * * column 3, lines 50-63 * * column 4, lines 39-45 * * column 4, lines 53-56 * * column 5, lines 9-16 *;
 [A]EP0795600  (SHOWA PHARM CHEM IND) [A] 2-7 * column A; figure 1 *