blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1214139 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1214139



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
09.03.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Annex Search / examination 15
25.11.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.11.2003 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
25.11.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
25.11.2003 Means of redress Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Description Search / examination 6
14.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
02.07.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.06.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.05.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.05.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 4
25.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
25.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.05.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.05.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.05.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.04.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.12.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
14.12.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
22.11.2001 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.11.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.11.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.11.2001 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.08.2001 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 4
07.08.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.08.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.08.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.05.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.05.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 16
04.04.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.03.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 15
19.10.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.10.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 4
19.10.2000 Description International Searching Authority 9
19.10.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 1